FL H4895 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Central Florida Zoo and Botanical Gardens Rainwater Harvesting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Florida Zoo and Botanical Gardens Rainwater Harvesting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseSee HB 5001 (line item 1635A)
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2020-01-17HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/20, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-16HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-12-04HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback