FL H4671 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1304A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 1304A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Selah Freedom Programs and Services for Victims of Sex Trafficking and Exploitation.
Title
Selah Freedom Programs and Services for Victims of Sex Trafficking and Exploitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1304A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-10 | House | Removed from Meeting Agenda of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-12-16 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-01 | House | Filed |