FL H4655 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Thelma Gibson Health Initiative - Intergenerational Senior Apartments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Thelma Gibson Health Initiative - Intergenerational Senior Apartments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2020-01-13HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-01-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-11-26HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-25HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback