FL H4651 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1657A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Indian River County North Sebastian Septic to Sewer Phase II.
Title
Indian River County North Sebastian Septic to Sewer Phase II
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Grall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1657A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4651 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4651/BillText/Filed/PDF |