FL H4639 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Trauma Focused Treatment Group Home for High Need Adolescent Girls.
Title
Trauma Focused Treatment Group Home for High Need Adolescent Girls
Sponsors
Rep. Melony Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4639 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4639/BillText/Filed/PDF |