FL H4597 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Infrastructure and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Stewart Street Facility Revitalization - Milton.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stewart Street Facility Revitalization - Milton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-08HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-08HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-12-08HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-01HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback