FL H4573 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-23 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Collier County Public Schools Hurricane Mitigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collier County Public Schools Hurricane Mitigation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-23HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 11:15 am, Reed Hall
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback