FL H4543 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 372)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 372)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Okaloosa-Walton Mental Health and Substance Abuse Pre-Trial Diversion Program.
Title
Okaloosa-Walton Mental Health and Substance Abuse Pre-Trial Diversion Program
Sponsors
Rep. Patt Maney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 372) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-08 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-01 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4543 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4543/BillText/Filed/PDF |