FL H4513 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the AMIkids Academic Enrichment Program.
Title
AMIkids Academic Enrichment Program
Sponsors
Rep. James Grant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 110) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-22 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4513 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4513/BillText/Filed/PDF |