FL H4421 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 19 @ 1:00 pm House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Quincy Waterline Expansion Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Quincy Waterline Expansion Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-06HouseNow in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-12-06HouseReferred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-30HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback