FL H4355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida FIRST Robotics Team Grant.
Title
Florida FIRST Robotics Team Grant
Sponsors
Rep. Chip LaMarca [R] | Rep. Al Jacquet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/14/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-21 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4355 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4355/BillText/Filed/PDF |