FL H4319 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1700A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1700A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Historic Spring Park Public Access Pier on St. Johns River.
Title
Historic Spring Park Public Access Pier on St. Johns River
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Payne [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1700A) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1700A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4319 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4319/BillText/Filed/PDF |