FL H4253 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Osceola Mental Health Inc d.b.a. Park Place Behavioral Health Care Updated Electronic Health Records.
Title
Osceola Mental Health Inc d.b.a. Park Place Behavioral Health Care Updated Electronic Health Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-30 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-29 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4253 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/4253/BillText/Filed/PDF |