FL H4239 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the City of Miramar - Southcentral/Southeast Focal Point Senior Center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Miramar - Southcentral/Southeast Focal Point Senior Center

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-12-12HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-12-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-20HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback