FL H4213 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provision relating to prohibition against processing, sale, or consumption of certain high-proof distilled spirits.
Title
Liquor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 12 HOB --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 141 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4213 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4213/BillText/Filed/HTML |