FL H4209 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions which require nongovernmental organization that sponsors program financed partially by state funds or funds obtained from state agency to provide disclosure of such sponsorship in specified manner; conforms provisions.
Title
Publication or Statement of State Sponsorship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 141 | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
286 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1671 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4209 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4209/BillText/Filed/HTML |