FL H4201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions which create Leadership Board for Applied Research & Public Service.
Title
Board for Applied Research and Public Service
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Ingram [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 140 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4201 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4201/BillText/Filed/HTML |