FL H4181 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - See HB 5001 (line item 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the VFW Youth Civics Education Scholarship and Civics Educator of the Year Recognition Program.
Title
VFW Youth Civics Education Scholarship and Civics Educator of the Year Recognition Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 101) |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-30 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |