FL H4165 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to Community-Based Development Organization Act, eligibility of community-based development organizations & eligible activities for certain grant funding, award of grants by DCA, & reporting of certain information by grant recipients to DCA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community-Based Development Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#230 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-21 In Messages
2011-04-20 Read 2nd time -HJ 698
2011-04-18 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/20/11
2011-03-24 Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 314
2011-03-22 On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/24/11, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2011-03-17 Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 260
2011-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/17/11, 3:15 pm, Webster Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 139
2011-03-03 Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 139
2011-02-15 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
163455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163456Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163457Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163458Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163459Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16346Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163460Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
163462Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback