FL H4145 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes reference to Department of Community Affairs; deletes provision specifying authority of DCA & authority & responsibility of state & local agencies to cooperate in administration of specified provisions.
Title
Formation of Local Governments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#75 (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-25 | In Messages | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time -HJ 297 | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/11 | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 260 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/17/11, 8:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 137 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/11, 8:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 137 | |
2011-02-09 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
165 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
165 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |