FL H4109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Circle of Brotherhood Miami Public Housing and Community Wellness Initiative.
Title
Circle of Brotherhood Miami Public Housing and Community Wellness Initiative
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-27 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-30 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-30 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Filed |