FL H4109 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1450)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Agricultural Plastic Recycling Market Development Initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural Plastic Recycling Market Development Initiative

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 1450)
2020-03-19HouseSee HB 5001 (line item 1450)
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2020-01-13HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/13/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-20HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback