FL H4097 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Lake County South Lake Regional Park Central Wastewater, Potable and Reclaim.
Title
Lake County South Lake Regional Park Central Wastewater, Potable and Reclaim
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Metz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-11 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4097 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/4097/BillText/Filed/PDF |