FL H4097 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deletes certain budget summary requirements; repeals provision relating to Mobility 2000 funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing Budget Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#83 (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-25 In Messages
2011-03-24 Read 2nd time -HJ 300
2011-03-22 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/11
2011-03-21 Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 -HJ 266
2011-03-17 On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/21/11, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 135
2011-02-16 Referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 135
2011-01-31 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0550 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
216013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3391371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489145Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback