FL H4085 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 247A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 247A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for Chabad of Kendall Hardening/ Friendship Circle.
Title
Chabad of Kendall Hardening/ Friendship Circle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 247A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |