FL H4059 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provision relating to future requirements for use of automated external defibrillators in assisted living facilities, including provision directing DEA to adopt implementing rules.
Title
Automated External Defibrillators
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Hudson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 134 | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to HHS Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 134 | |
2011-01-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0684 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4059 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4059/BillText/Filed/HTML |