FL H4041 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes cannabis from schedule of controlled substances; conforms provisions.
Title
Cannabis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1294 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
772 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
856 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 0551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 1351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
951 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4041 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4041/BillText/Filed/PDF |