FL H4033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provision authorizing Supreme Court to admit bar applicant who is unauthorized immigrant in certain circumstances.
Title
Admission of Attorneys to Practice Law
Sponsors
Rep. John Tobia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4033 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4033/BillText/Filed/PDF |