FL H4025 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to statewide toll-free school safety hotline.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Hotline

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in K-12 Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39)
2014-03-11HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Committee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7031 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-39, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 850 (Ch. 2014-184), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)
S1226 (Similar To) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7031 (Ch. 2014-39), CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2014-23)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback