FL H4025 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes exemption from payment of tuition & fees at school districts that provide workforce education programs & public postsecondary educational institutions for certain students who lack regular nighttime residence or sleeping accommodation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Fee Exemptions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-12HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2013-02-05HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback