FL H4025 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals ch. 205, F.S., "Local Business Tax Act."
Title
Local Business Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Finance and Tax Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 147 | |
2011-11-09 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 11/16/11, 11:00 am, Morris Hall --Workshopped | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 148 | |
2011-08-30 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
202 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 756 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 3761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 516 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 5315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
539 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 939 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/4025 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/4025/BillText/Filed/HTML |