FL H4013 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes adult general education program student fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce Education Postsecondary Student Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-28HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2015-01-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0884 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Higher Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100922Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101180Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback