FL H4001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 130)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Miami Dade College - Single Stop Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miami Dade College - Single Stop Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-04HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 130)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback