FL H4001 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions for cost recovery mechanisms for siting, design, licensing, & construction of nuclear & integrated gasification combined cycle power plants, including mechanisms that promote utility investment in, & allow for recovery in electric utility rates of certain costs of, such plants.
Title
Repeal of Advanced Nuclear Cost Recovery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2014-12-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-11-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0067 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
H0473 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
H0473 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4001 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/4001/BillText/Filed/PDF |