FL H3961 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the RISE Summer Math Academy - Lake County Schools with Lake-Sumter State College.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RISE Summer Math Academy - Lake County Schools with Lake-Sumter State College

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-02 Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 110)
2017-05-08HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 110)
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-03-13HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-02-24HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback