FL H3927 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Junior Achievement Workforce Readiness Programs Expansion.
Title
Junior Achievement Workforce Readiness Programs Expansion
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3927 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3927/BillText/Filed/PDF |