FL H3881 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Fruitville Road Capacity Improvement Project - Sarasota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fruitville Road Capacity Improvement Project - Sarasota

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-13 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-13HouseReported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseFavorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-11HouseAdded to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2021-11-30HouseNow in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-30HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-30HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-22HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback