FL H3881 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1222)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 1222)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Big Brothers Big Sisters Mentoring Children of an Incarcerated Parent (MCIP).
Title
Big Brothers Big Sisters Mentoring Children of an Incarcerated Parent (MCIP)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1222) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3881 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3881/BillText/Filed/PDF |