FL H3877 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Pasco County Gulfview/Salt Springs Culvert Expansion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pasco County Gulfview/Salt Springs Culvert Expansion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-02 Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
2017-05-08HouseSee SB 2500 (line item 1606A)
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-21HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2017-03-21HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/22/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall --Meeting cancelled
2017-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-01HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-02-22HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback