FL H3837 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Linking Educational Assets for Readiness Now (LEARN).
Title
Linking Educational Assets for Readiness Now (LEARN)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 84) | |
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 84) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/14/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3837 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3837/BillText/Filed/PDF |