FL H3833 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Florida's Vision Quest Children's Vision Services.
Title
Florida's Vision Quest Children's Vision Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-23 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |