FL H3827 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Communities In Schools of Florida.
Title
Communities In Schools of Florida
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Fischer [R] | Rep. Ramon Alexander [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Tracie Davis [D] |
Rep. Roy Hardemon [D] | Rep. Al Jacquet [D] | Rep. David Silvers [D] | Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 110) | |
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 110) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3827 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3827/BillText/Filed/PDF |