FL H3807 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Hollywood Design of New Disposal Facilities for Southern Regional WWTP Ocean Outfall Closure.
Title
Hollywood Design of New Disposal Facilities for Southern Regional WWTP Ocean Outfall Closure
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/18/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-30 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3807 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/3807/BillText/Filed/PDF |