FL H3801 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1261)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 1261)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Alzheimer's Project, Inc. - Bringing the Lost Home.
Title
Alzheimer's Project, Inc. - Bringing the Lost Home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 1261) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3801 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3801/BillText/Filed/PDF |