FL H3791 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Port Orange Howes Street and Orange Avenue Drainage and Stormwater Improvement.
Title
Port Orange Howes Street and Orange Avenue Drainage and Stormwater Improvement
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3791 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3791/BillText/Filed/PDF |