FL H3783 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Alternative Treatment for Veterans- University of South Florida.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Treatment for Veterans- University of South Florida

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-19HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-19HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/19/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-05HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-29HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback