FL H3749 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 105A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 105A)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the School Board of Miami-Dade Section 16 Land Sale.
Title
School Board of Miami-Dade Section 16 Land Sale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 105A) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-12-12 | House | CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-18 | House | Filed |