FL H3711 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Pembroke Park Septic to Sewer Improvements SW 30th Avenue.
Title
Pembroke Park Septic to Sewer Improvements SW 30th Avenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-23 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/3711 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/3711/BillText/Filed/PDF |