FL H3695 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Lotus House Education and Employment Program for High Special Needs Homeless Women and Youth.
Title
Lotus House Education and Employment Program for High Special Needs Homeless Women and Youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 124) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3695 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3695/BillText/Filed/PDF |