FL H3629 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-19 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for Earn to Learn Florida.
Title
Earn to Learn Florida
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-19 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-17 | House | CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 1:00 pm, 216 Capitol |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-11-28 | House | Filed |